Mead, Timothy Giles (CPSO#: 26694)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Timothy Giles Mead to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective January 20, 2016:

Dr. Mead was the subject of a College reassessment pursuant to a Specified Continuing Education or Remediation Program, dated September 7, 2011. As a result of the reassessment:

Dr. Mead will engage in professional education in medical record keeping.

Dr. Mead’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 12 months of completing the education in medical record keeping.

Dr. Mead must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); or

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);

and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Mead must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows:

Dr. Mead must not prescribe Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances, or any other Monitored Drugs. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca