Meaney, Brandon (CPSO#: 69377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Pediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Room 3A60
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73392
Fax: (905) 521-7914
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Findlay-Meaney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Meaney ( CPSO# 69377 )
Dr. S. Findlay ( CPSO# 69573 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Pediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Room 3A
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRANDON MEANEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEANEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1996