Meathrel, Kimberley Erin (CPSO#: 74832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital -
St Joseph of the Hotel Dieu
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Fax: (613) 547-4182
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston ON  K7M 7E4
Canada
Phone: 6135461858
Fax: 6135464060
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberley Meathrel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Meathrel ( CPSO# 74832 )

Business Address:
Kingston Medical Centre
725 Arlington Park
Kingston ON  K7M 7E4
Phone Number: (613) 546-1858

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
St Joseph of the Hotel Dieu
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3100

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY ERIN MEATHREL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEATHREL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 18 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)