Mechetiuc, Adriana Elena (CPSO#: 90810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Queensway Street West
Suite 100
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 270-3385
Fax: (905) 270-8330
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3420 Rebecca Street,
Unit 7
Oakville ON  L6L 6W2
Canada
Phone: (905) 847-2525
Fax: (905) 847-4447
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adriana E. Mechetiuc Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mechetiuc ( CPSO# 90810 )

Business Address:
Unit 7
3420 Rebecca Street
Oakville ON  L6L 6W2
Phone Number: (905) 847-2525

Business Address:
Unit 100
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 270-3385

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIANA ELENA MECHETIUC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MECHETIUC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011