Mechulan, Alexis (CPSO#: 92735)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Aix-Marseille II, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 21 May 2010 to 03 Jun 2010
PEAP - Resident - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jun 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Nov 2010 to 10 Jan 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Jan 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2011