Medel Castillo, Sebastian Andres (CPSO#: 96998)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Chile, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2011 to 19 Feb 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 20 Feb 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Sep 2013