Meer Daula, Nazly Nasim (CPSO#: 75953)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 26 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 27 Mar 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 26 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 27 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 26 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 27 Mar 2004 to 26 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 27 Mar 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005