Meffe, Filomena Mary (CPSO#: 54117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
15-018B Cardinal Carter
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5384
Fax: (416) 864-6073
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Filomena Meffe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Meffe ( CPSO# 54117 )

Business Address:
61 Queen Street East
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 864-5192

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5192

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 26 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FILOMENA MARY MEFFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEFFE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1985