Meghji, Mohamed Hassan (CPSO#: 94418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:Jawaharlal Nehru Medical College, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Well Medica Medical Centre
Unit 2-90 Resolution Drive
Brampton ON  L6W 0A7
Phone: 416-883-3877
Fax: 905-459-6472
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cannabinoid Medical Clinic
2nd Floor, 11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Canada
Phone: 1-888-282-7763
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Royal West Clinic
305 Royal West Drive
Brampton, Ontario, L6X 5K8
Brampton ON  L6X 5K8
Canada
Phone: 905-452-0200
Fax: 905-452-0212
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Pharmalinx Clinic
Unit 2 - 9301 Bathurst Street
Richmond Hill, Ontario, L4C 9S2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9S2
Canada
Phone: 905-237-7472
Fax: 905-237-2854
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.Hassan Meghji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Meghji ( CPSO# 94418 )

Business Address:
8 - 9301 Bathurst Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9S2
Phone Number: (905) 237-7472

Business Address:
305 Royal West Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 5K8
Phone Number: (905) 452-0200

Business Address:
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L1M 0H9
Phone Number: (888) 282-7763

Business Address:
90 Resolution Drive
Unit 2
Brampton ON  L6W 0A7
Phone Number: (416) 883-3877

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED HASSAN MEGHJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEGHJI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2011