Mehdi, Nadya Badruddin (CPSO#: 83662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Multi Specialty Clinic
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-8928
Fax: (905) 897-9229
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehdi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mehdi ( CPSO# 83662 )

Business Address:
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-9228

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (647) 267-3640

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADYA BADRUDDIN MEHDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2007