Mehrain, Shirin (CPSO#: 74864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, German

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehrain Narayan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Narayan ( CPSO# 73606 )
Dr. S. Mehrain ( CPSO# 74864 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
Suite 107
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone Number: (519) 273-1990

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRIN MEHRAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHRAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 22 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2002