Mehta, Darshana Jayvardhan (CPSO#: 93182)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Saurashtra University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Hamilton Community Health
Centre
438 Hughson Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 4N5
Phone: 905-523-6611
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARSHANA JAYVARDHAN MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Oct 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2012