Mehta, Sanjay Vinod (CPSO#: 71498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Calgary, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kindercare Pediatrics
491 Eglinton Avenue West, Suite 301
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: (416) 848-7664
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
525 University Avenue, Suite 1201
Toronto ON  M5G 2L3
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-4915
Fax: (416) 813-5043
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.V. Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mehta ( CPSO# 71498 )

Business Address:
301 - 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 848-7665

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Room 1201
525 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2L3
Phone Number: (416) 813-4915


Corporation Name: Drs. Chan Flanders Lalani & Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chan ( CPSO# 76358 )
Dr. D. Flanders ( CPSO# 77729 )
Dr. A. Lalani ( CPSO# 72007 )
Dr. S. Mehta ( CPSO# 71498 )

Business Address:
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 860-6696

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJAY VINOD MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001