Mehta, Shaun Dilip (CPSO#: 106517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Emergency Medicine
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-5959
Fax: 416-480-6797
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dilip Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mehta ( CPSO# 96288 )
Dr. S. Mehta ( CPSO# 106517)
Dr. D. Mehta ( CPSO# 33042 )

Business Address:
S446
Sunnyside Building
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6759

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Shaun  Dilip  Mehta  shall  practise  medicine  as  required  by the
                  postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. Mehta is enrolled  at
                  the University of Toronto.

            (2)   In  Dr.  Mehta's  practice in the postgraduate medical education program,
                  Dr. Mehta shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a
                  clinical teaching unit  that  is  formally affiliated with the department
                  where Dr. Mehta is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate
                  trainees are regularly assigned by  the department as part of its program
                  of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In Dr. Mehta's practice in the postgraduate  medical  education  program,
                  Dr. Mehta shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Mehta may practise medicine in the following settings:

                  (a)   adult critical care medicine and to the extent of his employment at
                        Lakeridge   Health  Corporation  Oshawa,  while  under  supervision
                        coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College;
                  
                  (b)   emergency medicine  and  to  the  extent  of his employment at Grey
                        Bruce  Health  Services  -  Owen  Sound,  while  under  supervision
                        coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and
                  
                  (c)   emergency  medicine  and  to  the  extent  of  his  employment   at
                        Collingwood  General  and  Marine Hospital Collingwood, while under
                        supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
            (5)   In Dr. Mehta's practice specified  in  paragraph  (4),  Dr. Mehta may not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This  certificate  of registration expires, and Dr. Mehta must  thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when Dr. Mehta  is  no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when  Dr. Mehta no longer  holds  Canadian  citizenship,  permanent
                        resident  status,  or  a  valid  employment authorization under the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically  converts   to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education certificate and Dr.  Mehta must immediately  cease all practice
                  outside  the  postgraduate medical education program if any  one  of  the
                  following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisors  identified  in paragraph (4) notify the College of
                        any  concerns regarding Dr. Mehta's  practice,  including  but  not
                        limited   to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the supervisors  are  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue to
                        supervise Dr. Mehta's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.   Mehta  to  engage  in  practice  outside   the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when  Dr.  Mehta's employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases;
                        or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr. Mehta  takes  a  leave  of  absence, or transfers to another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate education  program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In  the  event  of  conversion  to   a   regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7) or expiry  of  the  certificate  under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Mehta  may not  resume  any  practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education  program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. Mehta  applies  for  a  new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2017.  In accordance with paragraph
                  6(a),  this  certificate of registration expires on June 30,  2019.   All
                  practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice  outside   the   postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.