Mehta, Yatin Bobby (CPSO#: 84684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 1288
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Canada
Phone: (905) 430-4055 Ext. 6164
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-1700
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

B03-95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-2028
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yatin Bobby Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Mehta ( CPSO# 84684 )

Business Address:
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9

Business Address:
95 Bayly Street West
Suite B03
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 648-4347

Business Address:
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 683-1700

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YATIN BOBBY MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011