Mei-Zahav, Meir (CPSO#: 75628)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2002