Meier, Courtney Christian Leigh (CPSO#: 83771)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 10 Oct 2005 to 23 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Queen's University, 24 Oct 2005 to 28 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 10 Jul 2006 to 23 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2010