Meineri, Massimiliano (CPSO#: 81414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Aug 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Turin, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street 3EN 442
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3242
Fax: (416) 340-3698
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Massimiliano Meineri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Meineri ( CPSO# 81414 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street 3EN 442
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3242

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 16 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 09 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 09 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 24 Aug 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Massimiliano Meineri may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia,  University  of Toronto, in which Dr. Meineri holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Meineri no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.