Mejia, Jose Maria (CPSO#: 74365)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jose Mejia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2014

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2014