Mele, Tina Stefania (CPSO#: 78569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
Rm C8 - 004
339 Windmere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3970
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mele Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mele ( CPSO# 78569 )

Business Address:
Room C8-004
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3531

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TINA STEFANIA MELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2002 to 01 Nov 2002
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2004