Melnitzer, Melissa Dawn (CPSO#: 71594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 411
401 Richmond Street West
Toronto ON  M5V 3A8
Phone: (416) 533-0172
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jul 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA DAWN MELNITZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELNITZER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Mar 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2008