Melnyk, Lydia Catherine (CPSO#: 81339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Ukrainian

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
6624 Somerled
Montreal QC  H4V1T2
Phone: 5144866656

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYDIA CATHERINE MELNYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELNYK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006