Memon, Shahbaz Latif (CPSO#: 104532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pediatric Hematology
602-500 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Shahbaz  Latif  Memon  may practise medicine only as required by the
                  clinical fellowship program in  paediatric  haematology/oncology in which
                  Dr.  Memon  is  enrolled  in the Department of Paediatrics,  Division  of
                  Haematology/Oncology, University of Toronto;

            2.    Dr. Memon shall prescribe drugs  only for in-patients and out-patients of
                  a clinical teaching unit that is formally  affiliated with the department
                  where Dr. Memon is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate
                  trainees are regularly assigned by the department  as part of its program
                  of postgraduate medical education;

            3.    Dr. Memon shall not charge a fee for medical services; and

            4.    The certificate expires on December 31, 2018.