Menard, Cynthia Marie Marcelle (CPSO#: 74547)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Mar 2000 to 28 Apr 2000
Elective Trainee - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Apr 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2017