Menard, Sonia (CPSO#: 91053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Serbian

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P7P3
Phone: 9054727000
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

20 De Boers Dr
Toronto ON  M3J 0H1
Canada
Phone: 416-924-4646
Fax: 416-324-2556
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONIA MENARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2013