Mendelson, Asher Aron (CPSO#: 94587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital ICU-A
2nd Floor, F wing;
835 King Street W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-749-4300 Ext. 2631
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHER ARON MENDELSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDELSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2010 to 12 Dec 2010
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Jul 2012
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2014