Mendonca, Janet Ann (CPSO#: 85731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Goa Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30- 785 Westney Rd S
Ajax ON  L1S 7G1
Phone: (905) 239-5556
Fax: (905) 239-5757
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

East GTA Centenary AfterHoursClinic
Suite 207-208
2863 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-8630
Fax: (416) 724-0369
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mendonca Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mendonca ( CPSO# 85731 )

Business Address:
785 Westney Road South
Unit 30
Ajax ON  L1S 7G1
Phone Number: (905) 239-5556

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET ANN MENDONCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDONCA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2009