Mendoza, Maribel Bacani (CPSO#: 90455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:St. Luke's College of Medicine - William, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1B
6941 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H5
Phone: (905) 875-9999
Fax: (905) 875-9940
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maribel Mendoza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mendoza ( CPSO# 90455 )

Business Address:
Suite 1B
6941 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H5
Phone Number: (905) 875-9999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIBEL BACANI MENDOZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDOZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Sep 2010 to 25 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2011