Mendoza-Londono, Roberto (CPSO#: 83577)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Jul 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 228780
Fax: (416) 813-5345
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 02 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Roberto Mendoza-Londono may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,   Division   of   Clinical   and  Metabolic  Genetics,
                        University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr. Mendoza-Londono  holds  an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  when Dr. Mendoza-
                  Londono no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.