Menezes, Amber Supriya (CPSO#: 91160)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 7K8
Phone: (705) 472-2646
Fax: (705) 476-6543
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Menezes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Menezes ( CPSO# 91160 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 7K8
Phone Number: (705) 472-2646

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMBER SUPRIYA MENEZES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENEZES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015