Menezes, Natasja Maria (CPSO#: 79705)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cleghorn Early Intervention Clinic,
Level 0, SJHH, W5th campus
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 36586
Fax: (905) 525-2805
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATASJA MARIA MENEZES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENEZES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2003