Menjak, Ines Barbara (CPSO#: 95613)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
T2 041
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 29 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INES BARBARA MENJAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENJAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 29 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 30 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 29 Dec 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016