Menkes, Andrew Bernard (CPSO#: 27398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
2490 Hospital Drive
Mountain View CA  94040
United States
Phone: (650) 962-4600
Fax: (650) 962-4601

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW BERNARD MENKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENKES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1995