Menlove, James Frederick (CPSO#: 75285)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

220 Oxford St West
London ON  N6H 1S4
Canada
Phone: (519) 433-8333
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

400 Avondale
London ON  N5W 5P7
Canada
Phone: (519) 453-5111
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

9828 Ford Rd
St Thomas ON  N5P 3T1
Canada
Phone: (519) 433-8333
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Menlove Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Menlove ( CPSO# 75285 )

Business Address:
9828 Ford Road
St Thomas ON  N5P 3T1

Business Address:
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Business Address:
400 Avondale Road
London ON  N5W 5B7
Phone Number: (519) 453-5111

Business Address:
220 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 1S4
Phone Number: (519) 433-8333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES FREDERICK MENLOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENLOVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2003