Menon, Rajashree Krishnankutty (CPSO#: 75584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Care Centre
510 Second Street East
Cornwall ON  K6H 1Z5
Phone: (613) 938-2832
Fax: (613) 938-6421
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Canada
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Fax: (613) 938-4421
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.K. Menon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Menon ( CPSO# 75584 )

Business Address:
The Care Centre
510 Second Street East
Cornwall ON  K6H 1Z5
Phone Number: (613) 938-2832

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJASHREE KRISHNANKUTTY MENON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Sep 2000 to 04 Sep 2001
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Sep 2001 to 04 Sep 2002
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2003