Merali, Fatima Sadrudin Manji (CPSO#: 72259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2119 Old Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7R 1A4
Phone: (855) 210-0757
Fax: (855) 210-0758
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Canada
Phone: (855) 210-0757
Fax: (855) 210-0758
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Merali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Merali ( CPSO# 72259 )

Business Address:
2119 Old Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7R 1A4
Phone Number: (855) 210-0757

Business Address:
414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATIMA SADRUDIN MANJI MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002