Merchant, Asad Ali (CPSO#: 92907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of nephrology
University Of Toronto
8N819
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2G4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3047
Fax: (416) 340-4999
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2330 Kennedy Road, Suite 210
Scarborough, ON
Toronto ON  M1T 0A2
Canada
Phone: 416-335-1717
Fax: 4163351719
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASAD ALI MERCHANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCHANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2014