Merskey, Harold (CPSO#: 29608)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 28 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Oxford University, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 Fax: 416-398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Feb 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 28, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Merskey has resigned from the College.