Meshki, Malek (CPSO#: 92908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Malek Meshki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Meshki ( CPSO# 92908 )

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
630 Dublin Street
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2P0
Phone Number: (519) 323-2210

Business Address:
500 Whites Road
Palmerston ON  N0G 2P0
Phone Number: (519) 343-2030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALEK MESHKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MESHKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 27 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2015