Messner, Hans August (CPSO#: 27953)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 24 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2018

Summary

Date of Death: 24-Jul-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1975
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 24 Jul 2018