Mesterman, Ronit Ester (CPSO#: 81877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hebrew

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Childrens Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
H S C 3A56
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73392
Fax: (905) 521-7914
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mesterman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mesterman ( CPSO# 81877 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
1280 Main Street West
HSC 3A56
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 25 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Mar 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Aug 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Ronit Ester Mesterman may practise medicine only,

                  (a)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  McMaster  University, in which Dr. Mesterman holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (b)   in accordance with the requirement of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires when Dr. Mesterman
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.