Metawee, Mohamed Lotfy Mohamed (CPSO#: 84837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PACE clinic
11 Lakeside Terrace, Suite 302
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: (705) 721-442
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Metawee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Metawee ( CPSO# 84837 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Kentucky
USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio
USA - Tennessee

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Jan 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED LOTFY MOHAMED METAWEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. METAWEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 19 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2010