Methiwalla, Adnan (CPSO#: 97870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M4M 3H9
Phone: (416) 465-6606
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adnan Methiwalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Methiwalla ( CPSO# 97870 )

Business Address:
17 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M4M 3H9
Phone Number: (416) 465-6606

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Aug 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADNAN METHIWALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. METHIWALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 27 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2014