Mewa, Amirudin Akbarali Mohamedali (CPSO#: 33022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Dec 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 504
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 964-9214
Fax: (416) 964-6847
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Health Centre
45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Crescent Town Specialty Centre
4 The Market Place
Toronto ON  M4C 5M1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010


Corporation Name: Amirudin A. Mewa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Mewa ( CPSO# 103933)
Dr. S. Mewa ( CPSO# 106758)
Dr. A. Mewa ( CPSO# 33022 )

Business Address:
504 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 964-9214

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIRUDIN AKBARALI MOHAMEDALI MEWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEWA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1981