Mezody, Melitta (CPSO#: 74399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
5E 568
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 5798
Fax: (416) 603-5353
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto General Hospital
Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
Ambulatory Cardiac Clinics
585 University Avenue 5 North
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Medical Associates
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 781-9500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melitta Mezody Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mezody ( CPSO# 74399 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
5E 568
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
Ambulatory Cardiac Clinics
585 University Avenue 5 North
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4205

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Medical Associates
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Jul 2002 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Melitta Mezody may practise medicine independently in Cardiology, only.