Mian, Najam Junaid (CPSO#: 95794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Synergy Sports Medicine & Rehab
235 Wallace Avenue
Toronto ON  M6H 1V5
Phone: (416) 703-3525
Fax: (647) 343-8073
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Pain Medicine Effective: 15 Jan 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAJAM JUNAID MIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2017 to 15 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016