Michael, Kevin Anthony (CPSO#: 87082)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
302-11 Lake side Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: (705) 721-4422
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

PACE
Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P4
Canada
Phone: 905-953-7917
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Michael Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Michael ( CPSO# 87082 )

Business Address:
302 - 11 Lake Side Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 721-4422

Business Address:
PACE
602 - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P4
Phone Number: (905) 953-7917

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

South Africa
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 08 Mar 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 26 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Kevin Anthony Michael may practise medicine independently in cardiology.