Michalik, Edward Jozef (CPSO#: 90412)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 05 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Michalik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 May 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 May 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2015