Michalski, Warren Chaborek (CPSO#: 91657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River General Hospital
835 King St West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (905) 742-3611
Fax: (905) 372-4243
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (905) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

55 ERB STREET E
Waterloo ON  N2J 4K8
Canada
Phone: 519 497 4945
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michalski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Michalski ( CPSO# 91657 )

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WARREN CHABOREK MICHALSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHALSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2011