Michaud, Josee (CPSO#: 94660)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:Laval University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
306 - 865 Regent St S
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone: (705) 222-9009
Fax: (705) 564-9078
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E3B8
Canada
Phone: (705) 723-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michaud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Michaud ( CPSO# 94660 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1

Business Address:
865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9

Business Address:
1 - 1500 Paris Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3B8
Phone Number: (705) 222-9009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEE MICHAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MICHAUD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2010